Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Biglia

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy

Titular Archbishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1708³Born
15 Aug 173930.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 175445.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
28 Jul 175445.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
17 Aug 175445.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
29 Nov 175546.9DiedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Biglia
Archbishop Antonio Biglia (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Florence (Tuscany)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSant Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 16.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 183
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 36
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 234
  • dp: AT, 2 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017