Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas-Xavier Santamarie

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Sep 1726AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
22 Sep 1726Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
26 Aug 1776DiedTitular Bishop of Cyrene

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Xavier Santamarie
Bishop Nicolas-Xavier Santamarie (died ) Titular Bishop of Cyrene

  • a bishop for 49.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 180
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Jul 2016