Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Salomone

Deceased

Bishop of Carinola (Calina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1701BornSan Giacomo di Diano
22 Sep 172524.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 176058.6AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
9 Mar 176058.6Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
16 May 176664.8DiedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Salomone:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Salomone (born , died ) Bishop of Carinola (Calina)

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015