Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Maria (Gerolamo) Cardinal Quirini (Querini), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1680BornVenice
1696²15.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Mar 170221.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Nov 172343.6AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
30 Nov 172343.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
9 Dec 172646.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Jul 172747.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Brescia, Italy
26 Nov 172747.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Dec 172747.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
8 Mar 172847.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
4 Sep 173050.4AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
Aug 1740³60.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
11 Mar 174362.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
6 Jan 175574.7DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria (Gerolamo) Quirini (Querini):
Angelo Maria (Gerolamo) Cardinal Quirini (Querini) O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
  • a cardinal for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Dec 1726
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1723, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 127, and Page 172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015