Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Maria Giustiniani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1693³BornChien
17 Feb 171522.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Dec 171522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Dec 172633.9AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
22 Dec 172633.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
17 Apr 174148.2AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
5 Oct 176572.7DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pier Maria Giustiniani:
Bishop Pier Maria Giustiniani O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 339, and Page 380
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013