Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placido Pezzancheri, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1691BornPiacenza
16 Jan 172634.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Himeria
3 Feb 172635.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Himeria
12 Apr 172837.2AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
8 Dec 175766.8DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Placido Pezzancheri:
Bishop Placido Pezzancheri O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 221, and Page 380
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014