Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Tommaso Marana, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1690BornGenova
9 Jul 171322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Mar 172837.6AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
14 Mar 172837.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
7 Feb 175564.5DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Tommaso Marana:
Bishop Paolo Tommaso Marana O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 101
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015