Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Barlotta y Ferro

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thelepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1680BornPalermo
2 Jun 172040.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 172646.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
11 Aug 172646.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
11 May 176484.4DiedTitular Bishop of Thelepte

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Barlotta y Ferro:
Bishop Giuseppe Barlotta y Ferro (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Thelepte

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Mar 2014