Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Naselli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Numida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1687BornPalermo
2 Jan 170416.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Dec 171023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Sep 172840.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Numida
30 Nov 172841.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numida

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Naselli:
Bishop Alfonso Naselli O.S.B. (born ) Titular Bishop of Numida

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 294
  • ob/c2+: CB, 2 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Mar 2014