Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Bonanno, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1681¹Born
3 Mar 173453.1SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
5 May 173453.3ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
23 May 173453.3Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
18 Jan 175372.0SelectedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
28 May 175372.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
14 Jan 175473.0DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Bonanno
Archbishop Giacomo Bonanno C.R. (born 1681, died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanormi

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 297, and Page 324
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018