Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Gioeni

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

Titular Bishop of Assuras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1698BornPalermo
28 Sep 172122.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 174345.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
2 Dec 174345.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
2 Feb 174445.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
13 Dec 176163.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Gioeni:
Bishop Pietro Gioeni (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015