Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Matteo Natali

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1702³BornOletta
21 Dec 172624.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 175755.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina, Italy
19 Dec 175755.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
27 Dec 175755.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
5 Jun 176562.5AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
28 Aug 178279.7DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Matteo Natali:
Bishop Giulio Matteo Natali (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 61, and Page 407
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015