Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joaquín Fernández Cardinal de Portocarrero Mendoza

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1681BornMadrid, Spain
15 Jan 173048.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Jan 173048.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 173554.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
30 May 173554.2Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
9 Sep 174362.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174362.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
10 Apr 174766.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
9 Apr 175372.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
20 Sep 175675.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
22 Jun 176079.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Fernández de Portocarrero Mendoza:
Cardinal Joaquín Fernández de Portocarrero Mendoza (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
  • a cardinal for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 53, Number 227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013