Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Amato

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1697BornSalerno
15 Jul 174346.1AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
26 Jul 174346.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
Jan 176466.6DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Amato:
Bishop Felice Amato (born ) Bishop of Ischia

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013