Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giusto de Marco, C.R. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1704BornOtranto
4 Feb 172016.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
26 Jan 172723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 Dec 175147.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
21 Dec 175147.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
4 Oct 176965.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

MicroData Summary for Giusto de Marco:
Archbishop Giusto de Marco C.R. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 303
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015