Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo Lugaresi

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1698BornLugo
9 Nov 172123.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 174546.3AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
19 Mar 174546.4Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
29 Sep 175859.9DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Lugaresi:
Bishop Cristoforo Lugaresi (born , died ) Bishop of Comacchio

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013