Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando Romualdo Guiccioli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1686BornRavenna
10 Mar 174154.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
19 Mar 174154.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
5 Apr 174558.2AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
7 Nov 176376.8DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Romualdo Guiccioli:
Archbishop Ferdinando Romualdo Guiccioli O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 269, and Page 353
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015