Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Guiccioli

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1680BornRavenna
20 Sep 173050.6AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Portugal
21 Sep 173252.6ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Portugal
28 Feb 174565.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 174565.3AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
1 Aug 174565.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
13 May 175272.2DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Guiccioli (VIAF: 88982257)
Bishop Alessandro Guiccioli (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

  • a priest for 7.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,876
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 22
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016