Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Orselli

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1685³BornForli
3 Dec 171328.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 173449.2AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
28 Nov 173449.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
18 Mar 176377.5DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guido Orselli
Bishop Guido Orselli (born , died ) Bishop of Cesena

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 137
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016