Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leandro Cardinal di Porzia (Porcia), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1673BornPorzia
22 Dec 169623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Apr 172854.3AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
30 Apr 172854.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 May 172854.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
10 May 172854.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
20 Sep 172854.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
18 Nov 173056.9ResignedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
Jan 1740³66.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
2 Jun 174066.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leandro di Porzia (Porcia):
Leandro Cardinal di Porzia (Porcia) O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
  • a cardinal for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Apr 1728
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015