Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Scipione Maria Cardinal Borghese

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1697BornRome, Italy
25 Feb 172830.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 172830.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
30 Mar 172830.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
6 Jul 172932.1Elevated to Cardinal
3 Aug 172932.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
31 Mar 173234.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
20 May 174346.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
25 Sep 175255.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
12 Feb 175961.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
21 Jun 175962.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Francesco Scipione Maria Borghese:
Francesco Scipione Maria Cardinal Borghese (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
  • a cardinal for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jul 1729
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015