Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raffaele Cosimo Cardinal de’ Girolami

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1670BornFlorence, Italy
25 Jul 172655.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 172857.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
11 Apr 172857.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
9 Sep 174372.9Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174373.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
23 Sep 174373.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
10 Nov 174474.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
21 Feb 174877.4DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Cosimo de’ Girolami
Raffaele Cosimo Cardinal de’ Girolami (born , died ) Prefect of Indulgences and Relics

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Sep 2016