Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Gaetano Incontri

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1704BornVolterra
18 Sep 172824.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 173834.1AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
11 May 173834.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
29 May 174137.1AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
25 Mar 178177.0DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gaetano Incontri (VIAF: 88608130)
Archbishop Francesco Gaetano Incontri (born , died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 217, and Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Sep 2016