Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Albergotti

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Chalcis in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1685Born
27 May 172338.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 175570.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chalcis in Syria
30 May 175671.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chalcis in Syria

MicroData Summary for Antonio Albergotti
Bishop Antonio Albergotti (born ) Titular Bishop of Chalcis in Syria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018