Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Ginori

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1706BornFirenze
8 Sep 173125.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 173629.4AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
4 Mar 173629.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
1 Sep 177568.9DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Ginori
Bishop Francesco Maria Ginori (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 215
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016