Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luca Melchiore Cardinal Tempi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1688BornFirenze, Italy
31 Mar 173648.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 173648.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
15 Apr 173648.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
19 Nov 173648.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
19 Jan 174455.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
Feb 1744³55.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
26 Nov 175365.7Elevated to Cardinal
1 Oct 175466.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
21 Jul 175567.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
24 May 175668.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
23 May 175769.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
17 Jul 176274.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luca Melchiore Tempi (VIAF: 89085628)
Luca Melchiore Cardinal Tempi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
  • a cardinal for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 13
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016