Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal d’Elci

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1707Born
26 Apr 177365.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 177365.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
4 Apr 178779.4DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

MicroData Summary for Francesco d’Elci
Francesco Cardinal d’Elci (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Italy

  • a cardinal for 13.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Apr 1773

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018