Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Gaetano Novellucci

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1721Born
19 Dec 174423.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 175533.8AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
25 Jul 175533.8Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
17 Sep 175735.9DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Gaetano Novellucci
Bishop Domenico Gaetano Novellucci (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrato

  • a priest for 12.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast