Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonaventura Antonio Maria Giuseppe Barberini, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Ferrara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1674Born
18 Dec 170026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Sep 174065.8AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
18 Sep 174065.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
15 Oct 174368.9DiedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Antonio Maria Giuseppe Barberini
Archbishop Bonaventura Antonio Maria Giuseppe Barberini O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 215
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,740, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast