Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Maurice Gontieri (de Gonteriis)

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1659³BornTurin
21 Dec 169233.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 170546.4AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
21 Sep 170546.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
12 May 174283.1DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Maurice Gontieri (de Gonteriis):
Archbishop François-Maurice Gontieri (de Gonteriis) (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 109
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015