Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Alamanni

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1696BornFirenze
21 Jul 173236.3AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
25 Jul 173236.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
30 Nov 177579.6DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Alamanni:
Bishop Federico Alamanni (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a bishop for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015