Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Francesco Maria Cardinal Caselli, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Parma

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1740BornAlessandria
24 Sep 176322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
23 Feb 180160.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
29 Mar 180261.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
4 Apr 180261.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Side
9 Aug 180261.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
9 Aug 180261.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 May 180463.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Parma, Italy
20 Apr 182887.5DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Maria Caselli:
Cardinal Carlo Francesco Maria Caselli O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Parma

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
  • a cardinal for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 299, and Page 345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013