Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Maria (Cesar Philippe) Neuroni, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1690Born
1 Apr 171323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Jun 174656.3AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
19 Jun 174656.3Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
22 Apr 176070.1DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Maria (Cesar Philippe) Neuroni (VIAF: 88804553)
Bishop Agostino Maria (Cesar Philippe) Neuroni O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLugano

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 176
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018