Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Manciforte

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1692BornMontis Sancti
12 Apr 172734.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 174249.5AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
4 Mar 174249.5Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
17 Jan 174653.4AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
19 Dec 176270.3DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Manciforte:
Bishop Nicola Manciforte (born , died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 82, and Page 375
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014