Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Paolucci (Merlini)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1692BornForli, Italy
23 Dec 171927.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 172431.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
2 Jul 172431.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iconium
2 Aug 172835.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
20 May 173845.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
9 Sep 174350.7Elevated to Cardinal
20 Oct 174552.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
18 Apr 174653.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
20 Sep 175663.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
22 Nov 175865.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
13 Jul 176168.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
11 Jun 176370.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Camillo Paolucci (Merlini):
Camillo Cardinal Paolucci (Merlini) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
  • a cardinal for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015