Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Piazza

Deceased

Bishop of Forli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1707³BornForli
19 Oct 176053.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 176053.2AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
21 Dec 176053.2Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
12 Feb 176961.4DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Piazza:
Bishop Francesco Piazza (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

  • a priest for 8.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 218
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015