Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Juan Portugal de la Puebla

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1703BornAntequera, Spain
1 May 173733.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 176057.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
3 Aug 176057.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Perge
29 Mar 176258.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mantova, Italy
17 Jan 177066.6ResignedBishop of Mantova, Italy
29 Jan 177066.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
4 Mar 177167.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
16 Oct 178178.4DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

MicroData Summary for Juan Portugal de la Puebla:
Patriarch Juan Portugal de la Puebla (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 180, and Page 274
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 333
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 77, Number 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015