Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Agoselli

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1724Born
16 Jul 174722.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 176338.9AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
24 Jul 176338.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
8 Jan 179166.4DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Agoselli
Bishop Francesco Agoselli (born , died ) Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 138
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018