Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni (Jan) Pettani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Šibenik (Knin)

Titular Bishop of Cisamus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1715¹BornBrisca
13 Nov 174025.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Nov 174025.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 176348.5AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
24 Jul 176348.5Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
5 Feb 176752.0ResignedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
14 Feb 176752.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
13 Nov 177560.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni (Jan) Pettani:
Bishop Giovanni (Jan) Pettani (born 1715, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Šibenik (Knin)

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 166, and Page 379
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015