Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Pruski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Tanis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1682³BornBialynen
19 Dec 170523.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Mar 170623.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 172946.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
28 Mar 172946.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
17 Jul 172946.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
175976.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Pruski:
Bishop Andrzej Pruski (born , died 1759) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,453
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015