Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Kazimierz Horain

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

Titular Bishop of Hirina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1698²BornKoscieniewicz
5 Feb 172728.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Apr 172729.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 173133.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
24 Sep 173133.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
16 Mar 173233.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
3 Jun 176567.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
24 Jul 177476.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Kazimierz Horain:
Bishop Aleksander Kazimierz Horain (born Apr 1698, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 237, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015