Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Julian Sapieha

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1708³BornGedanon
15 Apr 173224.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 May 173224.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 173628.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jan 173728.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jan 173728.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria
1 Sep 173729.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria
4 Dec 175446.8DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Julian Sapieha:
Bishop Józef Julian Sapieha (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 22.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,871
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 196, and Page 442
  • b/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,702
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015