Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bogusław Korwin Gosiewski

Deceased

Bishop of Smoleńsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1669³BornLozdzieje
30 Jun 169222.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Oct 169323.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Apr 172252.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
20 Apr 172252.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Achantus
7 Mar 172454.3SelectedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
29 Jan 172555.2ConfirmedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
24 Jun 174474.6DiedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bogusław Korwin Gosiewski:
Bishop Bogusław Korwin Gosiewski (born , died ) Bishop of Smoleńsk

  • a priest for 50.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,185
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 66, and Page 359
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1722, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015