Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marius Ambroise Capello, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornAnvers
6 Jul 165457.5AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
13 Sep 165457.6Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
4 Oct 167679.7DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marius Ambroise Capello:
Bishop Marius Ambroise Capello O.P. (died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 88
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,523
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 12 Apr 2015