Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis de Berlaymont

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France

Administrator of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1542Born
15 Sep 157027.9SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
2 Apr 157128.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
4 Nov 157129.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cambrai, France
1593²50.2AppointedAdministrator of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
15 Feb 159653.3DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Berlaymont (VIAF: 108084316)
Archbishop Louis de Berlaymont (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerlaimont
Ordained BishopS. Paul, Anvers, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
Death PlaceMons, Belgium

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 149, and Page 316
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Oct 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018