Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Antoine Triest

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹BornBeveren-Waas
28 May 161135.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 161741.2AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
9 Jul 161741.5Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
25 Oct 162145.8AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 May 165781.4DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Antoine Triest:
Bishop Pierre Antoine Triest (died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 122, and Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015