Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Engelbert des Bois

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1578BornTornaci
20 Sep 160325.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 163051.6AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
7 Jul 163051.9Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
15 Aug 165173.0DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Engelbert des Bois:
Bishop Engelbert des Bois (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015