Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Corneille Janssen

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1585Born
20 Sep 161428.8Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 163650.7AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
28 Oct 163650.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
6 May 163852.5DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

MicroData Summary
Corneille Janssen
Bishop Corneille Janssen
(born , died )
Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeerdam, Netherlands
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame des Sablons, Church, Bruxelles, Prefecture Apostolic of Malang, Indonesia

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 374
  • ob/c2+: AT, 20 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025