Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Malang

Dioecesis Malangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Semarang
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 24,409 (9,427 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Jl. Guntur 2, Malang 65112, Jawa, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0341)362524
  • Fax: 323744

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Malang
27 April 1927ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Malang (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Malang
15 March 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Malang Vicariate Apostolic of Malang
Diocese of Malang
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Malang Diocese of Malang

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Malang
19505,0358,625,000.1%28281794111611ap1951
Diocese of Malang
196926,81410,350,000.3%15859454112932024ap1971
198047,60012,306,000.4%4525685012034324ap1981
199065,87215,001,033.4%13819470025649525ap1991
199980,98613,645,816.6%158610180143867926ap2000
200082,83214,328,160.6%18809884535760127ap2001
200182,84714,436,764.6%19821018209865327ap2002
200286,09314,508,947.6%2410412867233833728ap2003
200387,50014,683,054.6%2610513166741942928ap2004
200488,25514,829,884.6%2511714262142244128ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 2 Sep 2012