Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Manokwari-Sorong

Dioecesis Manokvariensis Sorongensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 14 May 1974
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Merauke
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 111,835 (43,196 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan, Jl. Jendral A. Yani 83, Kotak Pos 183, Sorong 98401, Irian Jaya, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0951)321.201
  • Fax: 333.083

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Manokwari
19 December 1959ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Hollandia Prefecture Apostolic of Manokwari (erected)
Diocese of Manokwari
15 November 1966ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Manokwari Diocese of Manokwari
Diocese of Manokwari-Sorong
14 May 1974Name ChangedDiocese of Manokwari Diocese of Manokwari-Sorong

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Manokwari
19709,146137,0006.7%141465316286ap1971
Diocese of Manokwari-Sorong
198016,915210,0008.1%113141,2082920ap1981
199029,676341,7398.7%514191,5617192614ap1991
199739,332448,3658.8%415192,0707293116ap2000
200047,197526,6309.0%515202,3596303118ap2001
200152,276543,5549.6%816242,1786424918ap2002
200254,567556,5839.8%916252,1826423918ap2004

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011